+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2021-53)
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 2:29 p.m. on March 4, 2021.
- Assigned Act No. 2021-53.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 391
- Third Reading Passed
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 150
- Third Reading Passed
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions
+ − Votes (2)
March 4, 2021: Roll 391
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 3
February 25, 2021: Roll 150
- Yeas: 83
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 18
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor