+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On May 17, 2024 in the House:
- Enacted
On May 8, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled
On May 8, 2024 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 8, 2024 in the House:
- Ready to Enroll
- Ready to Enroll
On May 8, 2024 in the Senate:
- Third Reading in Second House
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 1076
On May 8, 2024 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On April 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee Second House
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
On April 23, 2024 in the House:
- Third Reading in House of Origin
- Local Legislation Engrossed Substitute Offered
- Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 706
On April 23, 2024 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Local Legislation
On April 23, 2024 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 707
- Engrossed
On April 23, 2024 in the Senate:
- Pending Committee Action in Second House
On April 18, 2024 in the House:
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
On April 17, 2024 in the House:
- Local Legislation 1st Amendment
- Reported Out of Committee House of Origin
On April 11, 2024 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Local Legislation
- Pending Committee Action in House of Origin
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
May 8, 2024: Third Reading in Second House Vote
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 6
May 8, 2024: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 1076 Vote
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 5
April 23, 2024: Third Reading in House of Origin Vote
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 42
April 23, 2024: Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 706 Vote
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 87
April 23, 2024: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 707 Vote
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 91
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor