+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On May 20, 2024 in the House:
- Pocket Veto
On May 8, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Delivered to Governor
On May 8, 2024 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 8, 2024 in the House:
- Ready to Enroll
On May 8, 2024 in the Senate:
- Third Reading in Second House
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 1072
On April 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee Second House
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
On April 18, 2024 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Local Legislation
- Pending Committee Action in Second House
On April 18, 2024 in the House:
- Third Reading in House of Origin
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 669
On April 16, 2024 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee House of Origin
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
On April 11, 2024 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Local Legislation
- Pending Committee Action in House of Origin
+ − Votes (4)
May 8, 2024: Third Reading in Second House Vote
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 7
May 8, 2024: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 1072 Vote
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 7
April 18, 2024: Third Reading in House of Origin Vote
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 41
April 18, 2024: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 669 Vote
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 86
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor