+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on
- Governmental Affairs first Amendment Offered
- Pending third reading on day 24 Favorable from Governmental Affairs
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 704
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 703
- Rich Amendment Offered
- Rich motion to Table adopted Roll Call 702
- County and Municipal Government Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
May 12, 2015: Roll 702
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 15
May 12, 2015: Roll 703
- Yeas: 102
- Present/NV: 3
May 12, 2015: Roll 704
- Yeas: 103
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor