+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second House
- Enrolled
- Clerk of the House Certification
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
- Figures motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1217
- Signature Requested
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- McMillan first Substitute Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 813
- McMillan Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 814
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 815
- Drummond intended to vote "Yea"
- Engrossed
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education and Youth Affairs
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Children and Senior Advocacy
+ − Votes (4)
May 17, 2017: Roll 1217
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 6
May 4, 2017: Roll 813
- Yeas: 76
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 15
May 4, 2017: Roll 814
- Yeas: 93
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 11
May 4, 2017: Roll 815
- Yeas: 78
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 14
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor