+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pending third reading on day 10 Favorable from Governmental Affairs
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 106
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 105
- State Government Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 17, 2015: Roll 105
- Yeas: 94
- Present/NV: 11
March 17, 2015: Roll 106
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor