+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On May 7, 2024 in the House:
- Currently Indefinitely Postponed
- Read Second Time in House of Origin
On April 25, 2024 in the House:
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
On April 24, 2024 in the House:
- Ways and Means General Fund 1st Substitute
- Ways and Means General Fund 1st Amendment
- Reported Out of Committee House of Origin
On April 11, 2024 in the House:
- Re-referred to Committee in House of Origin
On April 9, 2024 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on County and Municipal Government
- Pending Committee Action in House of Origin
+ − Fiscal Notes (2)
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor