+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Forwarded to Executive Department
- Assigned Act No. 2014-187.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 808
- Third Reading Passed
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 454
- Third Reading Passed
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
+ − Vote
March 18, 2014: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 808
- Yeas: 21
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor