+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On September 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read Second Time in Second House
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Pending third reading on day 25 Favorable from Local Legislation
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 591
- Third Reading Passed
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Baldwin County Legislation
+ − Vote
March 6, 2018: Roll 591
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 76
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor