+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On September 16, 2019 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2019-248)
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 10:01 a.m. on May 16, 2019.
- Assigned Act No. 2019-248.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 759
- Third Reading Passed
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 364
- Third Reading Passed
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
May 15, 2019: Roll 759
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 11
April 25, 2019: Roll 364
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 92
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor