+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On August 11, 2015 in the House:
- Further Consideration
- Clouse motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Carried Over
On August 10, 2015 in the House:
- Poole motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Carried Over
On August 7, 2015 in the House:
- Gaston motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Carried Over
On August 6, 2015 in the House:
- Poole motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Carried Over
On August 5, 2015 in the House:
- Poole motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Carried Over
- Davis motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
- Ways and Means Education first Substitute Offered
- Third Reading Carried Over
On August 4, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
On August 3, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor