+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (30)
On May 31, 2023 in the Senate:
- AMD/SUB
- Reported Favorably
- Reported Out of Committee in Second House
- Read Second Time in Second House
On May 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- Referred to Committee
On May 24, 2023 in the House:
- Read First Time in Second House
On May 23, 2023 in the House:
- On Third Reading in House of Origin
- Adopt
- Amendment Withdrawn
- Carry Over to the Call of the Chair
- AMD/SUB
- Adopt
- Table
- Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended
- Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended
- Read Again a Third Time and Pass as Amended
On May 17, 2023 in the House:
- AMD/SUB
- Reported Favorably
- Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin
- Read Second Time in House of Origin
On May 16, 2023 in the House:
- AMD/SUB
- AMD/SUB
On May 11, 2023 in the House:
- Read Second Time in House of Origin
On May 10, 2023 in the House:
- AMD/SUB
- Reported Favorably
- Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin
On May 5, 2023 in the House:
- AMD/SUB
On May 3, 2023 in the House:
- Read First Time in House of Origin
- Introduced and Referred
+ − Fiscal Notes (4)
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Votes (3)
May 23, 2023: Adopt Vote
- Yeas: 100
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 1
May 23, 2023: Adopt Vote
- Yeas: 95
- Present/NV: 10
May 23, 2023: Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended Vote
- Yeas: 100
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor