+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On September 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Committee in Second House
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and referred to Committee on County and Municipal Government per Rule 50(b)
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Local Application Roll Call 834
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 833
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 832
- Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure first Substitute Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Rereferred from Calendar to TU&I
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Tuscaloosa County Legislation
+ − Votes (3)
March 15, 2018: Roll 832
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 25
March 15, 2018: Roll 833
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 31
March 15, 2018: Roll 834
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 39
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor