+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Shelnutt motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Carried Over
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on County and Municipal Government
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 621
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 620
- County and Municipal Government Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
April 19, 2016: Roll 620
- Yeas: 91
- Present/NV: 14
April 19, 2016: Roll 621
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 14
March 10, 2016: Roll 354
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 8
March 8, 2016: Roll 271
- Yeas: 102
- Present/NV: 3
March 8, 2016: Roll 270
- Yeas: 102
- Present/NV: 3
February 17, 2016: Roll 131
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 5
February 17, 2016: Roll 132
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor