+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 30, 2021 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2021-442)
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 2:25 p.m. on May 4, 2021.
- Assigned Act No. 2021-442.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Coleman-Madison Amendment Offered
- Barfoot motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1240
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1241
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Concurrence Requested
- Faulkner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1106
- Enrolled
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 764
- Third Reading Passed
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
April 29, 2021: Roll 1106
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 7
April 29, 2021: Roll 1240
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 7
April 29, 2021: Roll 1241
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 7
April 13, 2021: Roll 764
- Yeas: 86
- Present/NV: 17
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor