+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Lost in Second House
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass lost Roll Call 1484
- Lost in second house
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education Policy
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed
- Cosponsors Added
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 959
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 958
- Education Policy first Substitute Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy
+ − Votes (4)
May 31, 2019: Roll 1484
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 4
May 23, 2019: Roll 958
- Yeas: 86
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 6
May 23, 2019: Roll 959
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 2
May 23, 2019: Roll 960
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 45
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor