+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
- Pending third reading on day 25 Favorable from Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- C&SB 1st Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 598
- C&SB 2nd Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 599
- Brown Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 600
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 601
- Engrossed
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
March 13, 2014: Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
March 5, 2014: Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 598
- Yeas: 99
March 5, 2014: Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 599
- Yeas: 100
March 5, 2014: Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 600
- Yeas: 99
March 5, 2014: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 601
- Yeas: 98
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor