+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On September 17, 2018 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2018-473)
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Act No. 2018-473.
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Enrolled
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second House
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1050
- Third Reading Passed
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Forwarded to Governor on March 22, 2018 at 2:22 p.m. on March 22, 2018.
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 646
- Third Reading Passed
- Coleman Amendment Offered
- Clarke intended to vote "Nay"
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 647
- Hanes intended to vote "Yea"
- Engrossed
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business
+ − Votes (3)
March 22, 2018: Roll 1050
- Yeas: 25
- Present/NV: 9
March 8, 2018: Roll 646
- Yeas: 81
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 16
March 8, 2018: Roll 647
- Yeas: 78
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 20
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor