+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On August 10, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Delivered to Governor at 6:49 p.m. on August 10, 2015.
- Assigned Act No. 2015-504.
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Enrolled
On August 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On August 10, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second House
On August 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 57
- Third Reading Passed
On August 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On August 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
On August 5, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed
- Bracy intended to vote "Abstain"
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 14
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 13
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 12
- Ways and Means Education Amendment #2 Offered
- Ways and Means Education Amendment #1 Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On August 4, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments
On August 3, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
August 10, 2015: Roll 57
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 6
August 5, 2015: Roll 12
- Yeas: 77
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 21
August 5, 2015: Roll 13
- Yeas: 82
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 21
August 5, 2015: Roll 14
- Yeas: 86
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 14
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor