+ − Effective Date
- October 01, 2022
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (25)
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Forwarded to Governor on April 7, 2022 at 6:15 p.m. on April 7, 2022.
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Assigned Act No. 2022-367.
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Enrolled
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Concurrence Requested
- Ledbetter motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 971
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
- Singleton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1018
- Chambliss Amendment Offered
- Chambliss motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1019
- Gudger Amendment Offered
- Chesteen motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1020
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1021
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- Education Policy Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 640
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 641
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (5)
April 7, 2022: Ledbetter motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 971 Vote
- Yeas: 101
- Absent: 1
April 6, 2022: Singleton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1018 Vote
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 6
April 6, 2022: Chambliss motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1019 Vote
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 6
April 6, 2022: Chesteen motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1020 Vote
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 6
April 6, 2022: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1021 Vote
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor