+ − Effective Date
- April 11, 2022
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Forwarded to Governor on April 7, 2022 at 10:45 a.m. on April 7, 2022.
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Assigned Act No. 2022-296.
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Passed Second House
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1040
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- County and Municipal Government Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 569
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 570
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
April 6, 2022: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1040 Vote
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 6
March 10, 2022: Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 569 Vote
- Yeas: 100
- Present/NV: 3
March 10, 2022: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 570 Vote
- Yeas: 99
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor