+ − Effective Date
- July 01, 2022
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned Act No. 2022-389.
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Forwarded to Governor at 11:37 p.m. on April 7, 2022.
- Passed Second House
- Enrolled
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Passed Second House
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1095
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 788
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 787
- Scott Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Scott
Type:
Primary Sponsor