+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 757
- Third Reading Passed
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Singleton motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Carried Over
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 368
- Third Reading Passed
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
April 21, 2016: Roll 757
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 7
March 22, 2016: Roll 368
- Yeas: 21
- Present/NV: 84
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor