+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On September 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2018-256)
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 2:27 p.m. on March 8, 2018.
- Assigned Act No. 2018-256.
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Enrolled
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second House
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 699
- Third Reading Passed
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 368
- Third Reading Passed
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
March 8, 2018: Roll 699
- Yeas: 25
- Present/NV: 9
February 20, 2018: Roll 368
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 86
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor