+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Assigned Act No. 2013-338.
- Delivered to Governor at 9:20 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second House
- Enrolled
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1080
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Business and Labor
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Commerce and Small Business Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 899
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 900
- Engrossed
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
May 20, 2013: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1080
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
May 2, 2013: Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
- Yeas: 4
April 25, 2013: Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 899
- Yeas: 96
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor