+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (39)
On September 16, 2019 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2019-326)
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned Act No. 2019-326.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 9:45 a.m. on May 23, 2019.
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Shedd motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 887
- Concurrence Requested
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 990
- Givhan motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 989
- Givhan Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Carried Over
- Livingston motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
- Livingston first Substitute Offered
- Livingston motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 901
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Ingram motion to Carry Over Temporarily lost Roll Call 509
- Third Reading Carried Over
- Urban and Rural Development Substitute Offered
- Shedd motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Passed
- Urban and Rural Development Substitute resumed
- Blackshear motion to Carry Over Temporarily lost Roll Call 508
- Fridy intended to vote "Nay"
- Engrossed
- Lovvorn motion to Carry Over Temporarily lost Roll Call 510
- Motion to Adopt U&RD substitute adopted Roll Call 511
- Fridy intended to vote "Yea"
- Baker motion to Carry Over Temporarily lost Roll Call 512
- Jones (M) Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 513
- Shedd Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 514
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 515
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Urban and Rural Development
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (12)
May 22, 2019: Roll 887
- Yeas: 102
- Present/NV: 2
May 22, 2019: Roll 989
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 7
May 22, 2019: Roll 990
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 7
May 16, 2019: Roll 901
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 5
May 2, 2019: Roll 512
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 53
- Present/NV: 22
May 2, 2019: Roll 513
- Yeas: 91
- Present/NV: 13
May 2, 2019: Roll 508
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 48
- Present/NV: 16
May 2, 2019: Roll 515
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 10
May 2, 2019: Roll 514
- Yeas: 94
- Present/NV: 10
May 2, 2019: Roll 509
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 42
- Present/NV: 31
May 2, 2019: Roll 510
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 46
- Present/NV: 25
May 2, 2019: Roll 511
- Yeas: 84
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 18
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor