+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (30)
On November 1, 2021 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2021-546)
On October 1, 2021 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 2:25 p.m. on October 1, 2021.
- Assigned Act No. 2021-546.
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Enrolled
On October 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
On October 1, 2021 in the House:
- Clarke intended to vote "Nay"
- Clouse motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 12
- Concurrence Requested
On October 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 16
- Albritton motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
- Beasley first Substitute Offered
- Albritton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 15
- Finance and Taxation General Fund Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On September 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On September 29, 2021 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 4
- Ledbetter motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 3
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 2
- Morris 2nd Amendment Offered
- Hanes intended to vote "Yea"
- Morris motion to Withdraw adopted Voice Vote
- Engrossed
On September 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
On September 29, 2021 in the House:
- Morris 1st Amendment Offered
- Clouse motion to Table adopted Roll Call 1
- Hall Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On September 28, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On September 27, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (7)
October 1, 2021: Roll 16
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 4
October 1, 2021: Roll 12
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 6
October 1, 2021: Roll 15
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 5
September 29, 2021: Roll 1
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 26
- Present/NV: 3
September 29, 2021: Roll 2
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 6
September 29, 2021: Roll 3
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 27
- Present/NV: 2
September 29, 2021: Roll 4
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 27
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor