+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Forwarded to Governor on May 20, 2013 at 6:45 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
- Assigned Act No. 2013-323.
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Enrolled
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second House
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1058
- Third Reading Passed
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Dial table Dial motion to recommit adopted Roll Call 949
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Bussman motion to table Smitherman motion to rerefer adopted Roll Call 687
- Smitherman motion to rerefer
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 513
- Third Reading Passed
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
+ − Votes (3)
May 20, 2013: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1058
- Yeas: 19
- Absent: 3
May 9, 2013: Dial table Dial motion to recommit adopted Roll Call 949
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 8
May 2, 2013: Bussman motion to table Smitherman motion to rerefer adopted Roll Call 687
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor