+ − Effective Date
- April 14, 2022
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On April 5, 2022 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Forwarded to Governor on April 5, 2022 at 3:29 p.m.
- Assigned Act No. 2022-360.
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
- Signature Requested
On April 5, 2022 in the House:
- Concurrence Requested
- Lovvorn motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 884
- Clerk of the House Certification
On March 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Smitherman Amendment Offered
- Whatley motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 903
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 904
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Economic Development and Tourism Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 520
- Harbison Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 521
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 522
- Engrossed
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
April 5, 2022: Lovvorn motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 884 Vote
- Yeas: 81
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 4
March 9, 2022: Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 520 Vote
- Yeas: 86
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 15
March 9, 2022: Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 521 Vote
- Yeas: 81
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 13
March 9, 2022: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 522 Vote
- Yeas: 76
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 7
- Absent: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor