+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 1:44 p.m. on February 27, 2014.
- Assigned Act No. 2014-131.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 579
- Third Reading Passed
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 228
- Third Reading Passed
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Baldwin County Legislation
+ − Vote
February 27, 2014: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 579
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2