+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On September 16, 2019 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2019-444)
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 1:33 p.m. on May 29, 2019.
- Assigned Act No. 2019-444.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 28, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1235
- Third Reading Passed
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 557
- Third Reading Passed
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
+ − Votes (2)
May 28, 2019: Roll 1235
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 2
May 7, 2019: Roll 557
- Yeas: 100
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor