+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Clerk of the House Certification
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second House
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1175
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Commerce and Small Business Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 364
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 365
- Garrett intended to vote "Yea"
- Engrossed
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business
+ − Votes (3)
May 17, 2017: Roll 1175
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 9
April 4, 2017: Roll 364
- Yeas: 94
- Present/NV: 10
April 4, 2017: Roll 365
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor