+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor on April 21, 2015 at 3:10 p.m.
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Concurred in Conference Report
- Enrolled
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Conference Committee on HB39 2015RS first Substitute
- Assigned Act No. 2015-82.
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Williams motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 567
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Report
- Chesteen motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 420
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Concurrence Requested
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Committee Appointed
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Requested
- Marsh motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 440 P&PO appoints Melson, Singleton and Williams, Phil
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Governmental Affairs Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 416
- Governmental Affairs Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 417
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 418
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Concurrence Requested
- Chesteen motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 332 House appoints Chesteen, Lee and Scott
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- State Government first Substitute Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 46
- State Government Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 47
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 48
- Engrossed
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Read a second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and with 1 amendment
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (10)
April 16, 2015: Roll 420
- Yeas: 98
- Present/NV: 7
April 16, 2015: Roll 567
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 6
April 14, 2015: Roll 440
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 3
April 9, 2015: Roll 417
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 4
April 9, 2015: Roll 332
- Yeas: 95
- Present/NV: 10
April 9, 2015: Roll 416
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 4
April 9, 2015: Roll 418
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 4
March 11, 2015: Roll 46
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 12
March 11, 2015: Roll 47
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 9
March 11, 2015: Roll 48
- Yeas: 79
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor