+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On September 17, 2018 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2018-271)
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- State Government first Amendment Offered
- Delivered to Governor at 3:22 p.m. on March 13, 2018.
- Assigned Act No. 2018-271.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 750
- Third Reading Passed
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 196
- Third Reading Passed
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government
+ − Votes (2)
March 8, 2018: Roll 750
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 7
February 6, 2018: Roll 196
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor