+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On May 20, 2024 in the House:
- Enacted
On May 9, 2024 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
- Enrolled
On May 9, 2024 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 9, 2024 in the House:
- Ready to Enroll
On May 9, 2024 in the Senate:
- Third Reading in Second House
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 1204
On May 2, 2024 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee Second House
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
On April 11, 2024 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Local Legislation
- Pending Committee Action in Second House
On April 9, 2024 in the House:
- Third Reading in House of Origin
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 435
On April 4, 2024 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee House of Origin
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
On April 2, 2024 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Local Legislation
- Pending Committee Action in House of Origin
+ − Votes (4)
May 9, 2024: Third Reading in Second House Vote
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 3
May 9, 2024: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 1204 Vote
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 3
April 9, 2024: Third Reading in House of Origin Vote
- Yeas: 53
- Present/NV: 8
- Absent: 42
April 9, 2024: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 435 Vote
- Yeas: 19
- Present/NV: 8
- Absent: 76
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor