+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On September 16, 2019 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2019-533)
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1485
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
- Ward motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
On May 31, 2019 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 6:26 p.m. on May 31, 2019.
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
On May 31, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second House
- Enrolled
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 31, 2019 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Assigned Act No. 2019-533.
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education Policy
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1007
- Third Reading Passed
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy
+ − Votes (2)
May 31, 2019: Roll 1485
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 8
May 23, 2019: Roll 1007
- Yeas: 98
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor