+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
- Pending third reading on day 25 Favorable from Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Engrossed
- Drake Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 541
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 542
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 13, 2014: Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
- Yeas: 5
March 5, 2014: Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 541
- Yeas: 97
March 5, 2014: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 542
- Yeas: 100