+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned Act No. 2022-194.
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Delivered to Governor at 1:49 p.m. on March 17, 2022.
- Enrolled
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- Passed Second House
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 638
- Third Reading Passed
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 301
- Third Reading Passed
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor