+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On October 15, 2019 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2019-449)
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 9:17 a.m. on May 30, 2019.
- Assigned Act No. 2019-449.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1343
- Third Reading Passed
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 827
- Third Reading Passed
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government
+ − Votes (2)
May 29, 2019: Roll 1343
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 5
May 21, 2019: Roll 827
- Yeas: 99
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor