+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On September 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2018-246)
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 2:27 p.m. on March 8, 2018.
- Assigned Act No. 2018-246.
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Enrolled
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second House
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 703
- Third Reading Passed
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 279
- Third Reading Passed
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Lee County Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
March 8, 2018: Roll 703
- Yeas: 25
- Present/NV: 9
February 13, 2018: Roll 279
- Yeas: 19
- Present/NV: 83
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor