+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 999
- Third Reading Passed
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bussman motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Carried Over
- Singleton motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 293
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 292
- Local Legislation first Substitute Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
May 4, 2016: Roll 999
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 2
March 15, 2016: Roll 292
- Yeas: 17
- Present/NV: 88
March 15, 2016: Roll 293
- Yeas: 19
- Present/NV: 86
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor