+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On September 17, 2018 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2018-472)
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Forwarded to Governor on March 22, 2018 at 2:22 p.m. on March 22, 2018.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1046
- Third Reading Passed
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Act No. 2018-472.
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education and Youth Affairs
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Baker 1st Amendment Offered
- HB366 Third Reading
- Education Policy Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 674
- Cosponsors Added
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 675
- Baker 2nd Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 676
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 677
- Engrossed
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy
+ − Votes (6)
March 22, 2018: Roll 1046
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 7
March 8, 2018: Roll 674
- Yeas: 99
- Present/NV: 3
March 8, 2018: Roll 675
- Yeas: 98
- Present/NV: 4
March 8, 2018: Roll 676
- Yeas: 98
- Present/NV: 4
March 8, 2018: Roll 677
- Yeas: 99
- Present/NV: 3
March 8, 2018: Roll 678
- Yeas: 88
- Present/NV: 14
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor