+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
- Marsh table Marsh motion to recommit adopted Roll Call 1012
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections
- Smitherman motion to rerefer
- Williams motion to table Smitherman motion to rerefer adopted Roll Call 712
- Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Constitution, Campaigns and Elections Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 774
- Roberts Amendment Offered
- Williams (J) motion to Table lost Roll Call 775
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 776
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 777
- Lee and Scott intended to vote "Yea"
- Engrossed
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
May 9, 2013: Marsh table Marsh motion to recommit adopted Roll Call 1012
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 7
May 2, 2013: Williams motion to table Smitherman motion to rerefer adopted Roll Call 712
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 7
April 24, 2013: Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 774
- Yeas: 93
- Nays: 1
April 24, 2013: Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 776
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
April 24, 2013: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 777
- Yeas: 82
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 1
April 24, 2013: Williams (J) motion to Table lost Roll Call 775
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 66
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor