+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 4:33 p.m. on March 5, 2014.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned Act No. 2014-157.
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
- Reed motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 651
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 652
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Concurrence Requested
- Greer motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 506
- Enrolled
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 339
- Third Reading Passed
- Public Safety and Homeland Security 1st Amendment Offered
- Public Safety and Homeland Security 2nd Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 338
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Greer 1ST Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 340
- Greer 2ND Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 341
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 342
- Engrossed
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (7)
March 4, 2014: Greer motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 506
- Yeas: 101
March 4, 2014: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 652
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 1
March 4, 2014: Reed motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 651
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 1
February 18, 2014: Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 341
- Yeas: 96
- Absent: 1
February 18, 2014: Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 340
- Yeas: 97
February 18, 2014: Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 338
- Yeas: 97
- Absent: 2
February 18, 2014: Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 339
- Yeas: 95
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor