+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 455
- Third Reading Passed
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Rereferred from Local Legislation to Jefferson County Legislation
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
+ − Vote
April 11, 2017: Roll 455
- Yeas: 21
- Present/NV: 83
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor