+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Forwarded to Governor at 6:56 p.m. on March 19, 2014.
- Assigned Act No. 2014-242.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 895
- Third Reading Passed
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 151
- Third Reading Passed
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
+ − Vote
March 19, 2014: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 895
- Yeas: 19
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor