+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On September 16, 2019 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2019-361)
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned Act No. 2019-361.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 1:33 p.m. on May 29, 2019.
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Gudger motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1239
- Gudger Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1240
On May 28, 2019 in the House:
- Concurrence Requested
- Pettus motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1098
- Enrolled
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chambliss motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 443
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 442
- Ways and Means General Fund Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund
+ − Votes (5)
May 28, 2019: Roll 1098
- Yeas: 101
- Present/NV: 3
May 28, 2019: Roll 1239
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 2
May 28, 2019: Roll 1240
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 2
April 30, 2019: Roll 442
- Yeas: 102
- Present/NV: 2
April 30, 2019: Roll 443
- Yeas: 101
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor