+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1034
- Third Reading Passed
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Glover motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Glover motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Carried Over
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation, Mobile County
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 471
- Third Reading Passed
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Mobile County Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
May 4, 2016: Roll 1034
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 14
April 5, 2016: Roll 471
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 80
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor