+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read Second Time in Second House
On May 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Pending third reading on day 17 Favorable from Finance and Taxation Education with 1 amendment
- Finance and Taxation Education first Amendment Offered
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On May 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 284
- Third Reading Passed
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government
+ − Vote
March 10, 2020: Roll 284
- Yeas: 105
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor