+ − Effective Date
- July 01, 2022
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On March 31, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned Act No. 2022-261.
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Forwarded to Governor on March 30, 2022 at 10:20 a.m. on March 31, 2022.
- Enrolled
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- Passed Second House
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 813
- Third Reading Passed
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
- McClendon motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 573
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 572
- Allen Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 10, 2022: Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 572 Vote
- Yeas: 100
- Present/NV: 3
March 10, 2022: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 573 Vote
- Yeas: 100
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Allen
Type:
Primary Sponsor